Financial history CROYDON CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAUX LIMITED

Charity number: 298761
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £467.20k £420.96k £452.66k £615.15k £477.59k
Total expenditure £459.19k £465.39k £452.47k £476.84k £475.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £62.35k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £328.97k £265.00k £269.63k £438.56k £369.38k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £774 N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £614.27k N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £103 N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £476.84k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £5.34k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A