Trustees CROYDON CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAUX LIMITED
Charity number: 298761

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Carolyn Dealey | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Frances Helen McDonnell | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Syed Ameer Khan | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Lyons | Trustee | 25 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Bahooshy | Trustee | 06 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Cheryl Amanda Gowar | Trustee | 06 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Davina Jane Hehir | Trustee | 22 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
James Andrew Blyth DAGLISH | Trustee | 16 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
HOMER TAYLOR | Trustee | 11 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
DR PATRICIA KNIGHT | Trustee | 11 November 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.