Governing document THE BRISTOL SOUP RUN TRUST
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 15TH DECEMBER 1987 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 12TH FEBRUARY 1988. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07 APR 1988 as amended on 26 Oct 2021 as amended on 13 Sep 2021
Charitable objects
The objects of the Charity are: The prevention and relief of poverty by the provision of food, advice, support and assistance to persons in need, in particular (but not limited to) those who are homeless or at risk of becoming homeless or otherwise suffering the effects of poverty.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE BRISTOL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.