THIRD PERIVALE SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 299232
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £12.01k £6.98k £7.91k £7.59k £10.21k
Total expenditure £9.28k £6.22k £6.35k £7.73k £2.60k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £10.00k