Trustees BRITISH SOCIETY OF PAEDIATRIC GASTROENTEROLOGY AND NUTRITION
Charity number: 299294
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr KEITH LINDLEY | Chair | 27 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Dharamveer Basude | Trustee | 10 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr ASTOR RODRIGUES | Trustee | 10 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sanjaykumar Radhakrishnan | Trustee | 10 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jutta Koglmeier | Trustee | 27 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Andrew Barclay | Trustee | 27 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Shevta Chana | Trustee | 14 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Kornilia Nikaki | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Marco Gasparetto | Trustee | 27 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Nadeem Ahmad Afzal | Trustee | 27 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tassos Grammatikopoulos Dr | Trustee | 30 January 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.