THE UNITED KINGDOM ENVIRONMENTAL LAW ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 299498
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 21 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 21 August 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 10 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 10 June 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 23 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 23 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 19 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 19 June 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 21 June 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 21 June 2016 On time Download