THE TELZ TALMUDICAL ACADEMY AND TALMUD TORAH TRUST

Charity number: 299687
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £1.49m £1.83m £2.52m £1.73m £1.20m
Total expenditure £1.48m £1.78m £2.53m £1.55m £1.40m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £1.83m £2.52m £1.73m £1.20m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.49m £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.48m £1.78m £2.53m £1.55m £1.40m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £155 £0
Expenditure - Governance £2.00k £2.95k £2.77k £3.00k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £1.48m £1.78m £2.52m £1.55m £1.40m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £12 £4 £0 £0 £3.00k