SEND A COW

Charity number: 299717
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 10 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 10 March 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 20 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 20 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 02 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 02 November 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 08 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 08 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2016 16 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 16 March 2017 On time Download