SEND A COW

Charity number: 299717
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £6.52m £6.91m £7.58m £8.35m £7.19m
Total expenditure £6.75m £6.89m £7.26m £8.29m £7.16m
Income from government contracts £0 £1.13m £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.16m £0 £735.83k £1.48m £819.44k
Income - Donations and legacies £3.25m £3.36m £3.62m £3.90m £3.26m
Income - Other trading activities £3.44k £2.04k £6.63k £14.09k £14.69k
Income - Charitable activities £3.23m £3.48m £3.68m £4.41m £3.82m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £3.20k £2.75k £2.27k £284 £1.48k
Income - Other £40.10k £61.71k £266.08k £20.45k £96.40k
Income - Legacies £275.88k £521.48k £471.70k £767.31k £288.76k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £5.46m £5.85m £6.18m £6.69m £5.76m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.29m £1.04m £1.08m £1.60m £1.40m
Expenditure - Governance £223.56k £102.64k £110.33k £229.11k £264.60k
Expenditure - Grants institution £536.07k £486.56k £521.30k £424.09k £297.26k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0