SEND A COW

Charity number: 299717
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Isabella Wemyss Trustee 12 December 2014
EMERGE POVERTY FREE Received: On time
Fiona Crisp Trustee 16 December 2015
EMERGE POVERTY FREE Received: On time
Stephanie Dennison Trustee 16 December 2015
EMERGE POVERTY FREE Received: On time
Alison Jane Griffith Trustee 22 January 2020
EMERGE POVERTY FREE Received: On time
Andrew Gillam Trustee 18 January 2019
EMERGE POVERTY FREE Received: On time
John Geake Chair 12 December 2014
EMERGE POVERTY FREE Received: On time
DR ANDREW JIMMY MUBEEZI-MAGOOLA PHD Trustee 29 January 2018
EMERGE POVERTY FREE Received: On time
PETER HINTON Trustee 12 December 2014
HINTON TRUST Received: On time
EMERGE POVERTY FREE Received: On time
Simon Doherty Trustee 18 January 2019
EMERGE POVERTY FREE Received: On time