Dogfen lywodraethu BOVEY TRACEY ACTIVITIES TRUST
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20TH JULY 1988 AS AMENDED 8 MARCH 2000, 3 MARCH 2004, 1 MARCH 2006 AND 7 APRIL 2010 . as amended on 04 Oct 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO (A) ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF ELDERLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN BOVEY TRACEY AND ITS SURROUNDING LOCALITY. (B) PROMOTE THE WELFARE OF SUCH ELDERLY PERSONS IN ANY MANNER WHICH NOW IS OR HEREINAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE AND (C) PROMOTE OR ASSIST ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR ORGANISATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF BOVEY TRACEY AND ITS SURROUNDING LOCALITY.
Maes buddion
BOVEY TRACEY AND SURROUNDING AREA
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.