AGE CONCERN KINGSTON UPON THAMES

Charity number: 299988
Charity reporting is up to date (5 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £2.04m £2.41m £2.42m £2.71m £2.54m
Total expenditure £1.94m £2.81m £2.92m £3.08m £2.94m
Income from government contracts £646.66k £1.01m £953.12k £1.18m £880.06k
Income from government grants £45.00k £45.00k N/A N/A £16.82k
Income - Donations and legacies £385.36k £30.18k £30.05k £47.22k £35.27k
Income - Other trading activities £6.63k £20.46k £13.61k £11.80k £12.30k
Income - Charitable activities £1.53m £2.23m £2.24m £2.52m £2.37m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £121.16k £132.85k £135.50k £128.80k £114.32k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £337.41k £28.76k £1.00k £6.29k £1.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.94m £2.19m £2.92m £3.08m £2.94m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £4.40k £9.20k £5.98k £6.05k £6.12k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £620.38k £0 £0 £0