2ND ABINGDON SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 300482
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £32.99k £54.45k £43.68k £47.44k £49.64k
Total expenditure £39.31k £53.46k £31.43k £55.19k £41.43k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A