PARISH HALL ST KEW

Charity number: 300622
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 11 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 11 June 2020 224 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 01 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 14 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 07 September 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required