28TH CAMBRIDGE (ST JOHN'S) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 300713
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 23 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 23 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 21 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 21 May 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 26 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

26 June 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 23 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

23 August 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 22 June 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required