Accounts and annual returns 5TH REDRUTH SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 300730
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 01 August 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 04 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 23 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 10 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 28 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required