2ND ST AUSTELL -CHARLESTOWN SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 300739
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2020 12 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2019 26 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2018 01 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2017 21 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2016 28 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2016 Not Required