AYLESBEARE VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 300752
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 28/02/2017 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020 28/02/2021
Total gross income £6.93k £7.36k £14.58k £8.32k £17.42k
Total expenditure £5.90k £6.94k £13.96k £11.08k £11.08k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £16.00k