BEER VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 300760
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £26.13k £23.27k £21.42k £24.41k £15.33k
Total expenditure £18.88k £18.90k £19.81k £31.86k £11.82k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £11.33k