MEAVY PARISH HALL

Charity number: 300899
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 22 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 18 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 08 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 04 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 31 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required