MEAVY PARISH HALL

Charity number: 300899
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £7.30k £11.13k £8.84k £9.29k £18.08k
Total expenditure £8.89k £11.48k £12.24k £9.57k £14.42k
Income from government contracts N/A £276 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A £14.08k