Trustees 10th Torbay (Babbacombe) Sea Scout Group
Charity number: 301087
Charity reporting is up to date (58 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Justin Wiggin | Chair | 17 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Hallows | Trustee | 12 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Bateman | Trustee | 13 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jamie Parfitt | Trustee | 22 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Craig Hayward | Trustee | 14 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
JOSEPH ANDREW SPALDING | Trustee | 16 July 2019 |
|
|||||
Nicola Ann Spalding | Trustee | 09 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Angela Jane Slay | Trustee | 09 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mark Willis | Trustee | 09 July 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.