101 (CITY OF LONDON) ENGINEER REGIMENT (RICHMOND HILL) CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1113553
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Lt Col Mark Sean Robert Bennett RE Trustee 01 October 2020 None on record
Major Ebrahim Ahmed Mukhtar RE Trustee 07 October 2021 None on record
Lt Col Richard Bouke Hawkins MBE Trustee 03 October 2019 None on record
Warrant Officer Class One Darrell Martin Ball RE Trustee 13 July 2020 None on record
Martin James Heffer Trustee 03 October 2019
THE PATTENMAKERS COMPANY CHARITABLE FOUNDATION Received: On time
Brigadier AMG Smyth QVRM TD Chair 01 January 2015 None on record