Trustees VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 301281
Charity reporting is overdue by 84 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rory Burchanan Landman | Trustee | 02 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jane Osgathorp | Trustee | 17 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Philip James Gravett | Trustee | 15 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Clare Jane Godfrey | Trustee | 26 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Ian James Rogers | Trustee | 19 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Helen Melville-Smith | Trustee | 20 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Melanie Jane Chandler | Trustee | 03 November 2014 |
|
|||||
MICHAEL GEORGE DEARMAN | Trustee | 01 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
Richard Keeling | Trustee | 01 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
IAN JOHN MARIS | Trustee | 12 June 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.