CHARITY KNOWN AS SOUTH WOODHAM FERRERS VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 301405
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 07 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 07 September 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 COVID filing extension granted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 COVID filing extension granted Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 03 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 03 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 17 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

17 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 23 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

23 June 2017 On time Download