SPARKE EVANS PARK

Charity number: 301707
Charity reporting is overdue by 1814 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 353 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 353 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 719 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 719 days
Annual return 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1084 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1084 days
Annual return 31 March 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1449 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1449 days
Annual return 31 March 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1814 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1814 days