Financial history OAKRIDGE WEST COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 301733
Charity reporting is up to date (75 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £27.42k £28.14k £22.88k £7.69k £16.78k
Total expenditure £27.23k £28.50k £25.26k £7.80k £10.90k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £10.00k