Accounts and annual returns THE BASEMENT YOUTH CENTRE

Charity number: 301775
Charity reporting is overdue by 1596 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 135 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 135 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 500 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 500 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 865 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 865 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 1230 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 1230 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1596 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1596 days