Financial history THE BASEMENT YOUTH CENTRE

Charity number: 301775
Charity reporting is overdue by 1595 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2004 31/03/2005 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008
Total gross income £9.99k £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £7.93k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A