EAST OAKLEY VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 301808
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 11 October 2020 10 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 11 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 11 October 2019 29 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 11 October 2019 Not Required
Annual return 12 October 2018 28 January 2020 169 days late
Accounts and TAR 12 October 2018 Not Required
Annual return 12 October 2017 22 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 12 October 2017 Not Required
Annual return 12 October 2016 20 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 12 October 2016 Not Required