EAST OAKLEY VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 301808
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 12/10/2016 12/10/2017 12/10/2018 11/10/2019 11/10/2020
Total gross income £6.84k £7.61k £8.33k £8.33k £14.15k
Total expenditure £8.76k £5.86k £9.27k £9.27k £5.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £10.00k