Trustees THRUXTON MEMORIAL HALL

Charity number: 301969
Charity reporting is overdue by 109 days

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Louise Hannah Cushine Trustee 14 June 2022
None on record
Clare Frances Oliver Trustee 08 April 2022
None on record
Nick williams Trustee 05 May 2021
None on record
Keith Edwards Trustee 14 October 2020
None on record
Gillian Kay Odling Trustee 09 January 2019
None on record
Graham Clifford Harris Trustee 10 May 2017
None on record