Trustees 24TH CHELTENHAM (LECKHAMPTON) SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 302106
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ian Robson | Chair | 23 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Robert Boyd Gilchrist | Trustee | 04 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Justin Douglas William Forbes | Trustee | 20 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ian Christopher Orr | Trustee | 04 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
kerry conway | Trustee | 13 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mitchell Wolfe | Trustee | 13 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michael Whelan | Trustee | 20 August 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.