Trustees 26TH BRISTOL (NORTH COTE) SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 302156
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Alex Doerr | Trustee | 22 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Karen Tindall | Trustee | 22 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
George Sawkins | Trustee | 03 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Frances Chesneau | Trustee | 03 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jill Neild | Trustee | 03 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Martha Taylor | Trustee | 03 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sebastian Brown | Trustee | 03 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Tim Baker | Trustee | 03 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Mitchell | Trustee | 03 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jonathan Barton | Trustee | 03 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
James Rowe | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Richard Michael Bennett | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr ALVAR BRAY | Trustee | 02 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
Helen Shirley Hobbs | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.