Trustees 10TH ROMSEY SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 302283
Charity reporting is overdue by 85 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDREW BARLOW HILLIER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Agnieszka Monika Sebrell | Trustee | 13 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Andrew Alexander Hodge | Trustee | 13 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Elizabeth Edwards | Trustee | 28 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Michael Templer | Trustee | 28 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Leslie Slater | Trustee | 17 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Frank Henderson | Trustee | 17 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Julie Elizabeth Foster | Trustee | 17 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN WILLIAM WOODROW | Trustee | 16 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
MARTYN EDWARD BLAKE | Trustee | 28 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
RYAN DENNIS ORGILL | Trustee | 28 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
STEWART CHARLES BUSWELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
AMANDA KATHLEEN BERENDSEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER NIGEL GARLAND | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
IAN MOORE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR LES HERBERT | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.