Accounts and annual returns HEMEL HEMPSTEAD DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 302536
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 10 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 10 June 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 24 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 24 July 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 12 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 12 June 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 26 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

26 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 18 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 18 June 2017 On time Download Open in new window