Financial history HEMEL HEMPSTEAD DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 302536
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £141.08k £96.66k £97.96k £84.07k £73.81k
Total expenditure £105.88k £151.32k £75.64k £68.62k £57.08k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A