17TH ST ALBANS (ST MICHAEL'S) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 302576
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £16.38k £16.26k £23.30k £12.84k £19.40k
Total expenditure £16.41k £19.47k £18.66k £15.15k £16.50k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £225 N/A £225
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A