Accounts and annual returns 9TH NORTH WATFORD (WOODSIDE) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 302601
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 01 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 10 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 11 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 03 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 01 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required