Accounts and annual returns THE MEMORIAL HALL-FRITTENDEN

Charity number: 302746
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2021 24 April 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 24 April 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 09 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 09 February 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 16 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 01 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 21 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required