Financial history THE MEMORIAL HALL-FRITTENDEN

Charity number: 302746
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £11.15k £8.78k £9.54k £107.00k £40.44k
Total expenditure £5.76k £5.72k £7.16k £6.46k £122.06k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £5.00k £28.05k