WYE VILLAGE HALL AND RECREATION GROUND CHARITY

Charity number: 302899
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £69.08k £181.57k £338.17k £89.59k £37.34k
Total expenditure £52.63k £41.57k £51.43k £76.21k £29.77k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £95.00k £218.32k £21.59k £11.94k