Financial history SIR PHILIP GAME BOYS' CLUB

Charity number: 302980
Charity reporting is overdue by 75 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £36.77k £48.30k £41.33k £28.93k £48.30k
Total expenditure £46.52k £40.19k £44.04k £28.75k £42.57k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £6.72k N/A