THE QUATT HOUSE TRUST

Charity number: 1064197
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 16 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 16 June 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 08 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 08 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 01 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 01 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 28 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 28 September 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 24 February 2017 24 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 24 February 2017 24 days late Download