Financial history Lighthouse Christian Books and Cafe

Charity number: 1063294
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £64.92k £58.58k £126.37k £44.60k £42.93k
Total expenditure £60.36k £58.55k £54.88k £65.97k £50.01k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £14.79k