Trustees 1ST ST NEOTS SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 303347
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alan Keith Watson | Chair | 23 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Martyn Wright | Trustee | 09 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Jayne Davies | Trustee | 06 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Elinor Warburton | Trustee | 22 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Helen Mary Barnard | Trustee | 22 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Adam Shaun Wright | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Jane Gregorious | Trustee | 16 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Gareth Henry Howell | Trustee | 16 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
KEITH CHARLES HORN | Trustee | 14 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
Graham Capper | Trustee | 01 April 2007 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.