Trustees WILTSHIRE CITIZENS ADVICE
Charity number: 1062219

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Barrie Driscoll | Chair | 16 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Heather Jane Alleyne | Trustee | 13 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
SIMON PETER BRETT | Trustee | 09 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
KIRSTEN JANE HAASJES | Trustee | 19 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP JOHN RICHTER | Trustee | 19 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Lawley | Trustee | 23 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Parvis Homayounfar Jamieson | Trustee | 18 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dominic Anthony Szanto | Trustee | 09 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
EMMA JANE DARK | Trustee | 21 June 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.