Financial history KESKERDH KERNOW LIMITED

Charity number: 1062022
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020 31/05/2021
Total gross income £1.30k £671 £1.89k £4.44k £160
Total expenditure £416 £1.32k £2.55k £4.48k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A