Dogfen lywodraethu KING'S SCHOOL, BRUTON
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20/01/1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02/10/1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/06/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/09/2003 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 02/09/2012
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION THROUGH THE PROVISION OF AN INDEPENDENT DAY AND BOARDING SCHOOL KNOWN AS KING'S SCHOOL, BRUTON OR SUCH OTHER SCHOOL AS THE BOARD OF GOVERNORS SHALL DETERMINE AND TO MAINTAIN ITS TRADITION OF CHRISTIAN EDUCATION.
Maes buddion
IN PRACTICE THE CATCHMENT AREA OF THE SCHOOL
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.