Trustees THE DORSET NATURAL HISTORY AND ARCHAEOLOGICAL SOCIETY
Charity number: 1062400
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Tucker | Trustee | 22 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Claire Dixon | Trustee | 03 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Laura Southall | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter Sharman | Trustee | 01 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
James Smyllie | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Morag Wood | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
David French | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Chevalier | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jean Mary Lang | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Marie Parsons | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|||||
Sian Merriot | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.